Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Assigned Pa 0015'23
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Filed With Secretary Of State 04/13/2023 11:42 Am
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Approved By Governor 04/13/2023 09:52 Am
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Presented To Governor 04/10/2023 01:05 Pm
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Ordered Enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Full Title Agreed To
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Returned To Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Inserted Full Title
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 48 Yeas 64 Nays 44 Excused 0 Not Voting 2
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Read A Third Time
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Placed On Third Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Read A Second Time
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Referred To Second Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Placed On Immediate Passage
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Read A First Time
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Received On 03/16/2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Immediate Effect Defeated
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Passed Roll Call # 87 Yeas 22 Nays 15 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Substitute (s-3) Defeated
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Rules Suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Substitute (s-1) Concurred In
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
Committee Recommended Immediate Effect
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Civil Rights, Judiciary, And Public Safety
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2023
|
Introduced By Senator Jeff Irwin
|
|
|