Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan Senate Bill SB0081 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 22, 2023
Bill March 16, 2023

Enrolled

Bill April 10, 2023

Chaptered

Bill April 13, 2023