Senate
|
10/25/2023
|
Assigned Pa 0173'23 With Immediate Effect
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/25/2023
|
Filed With Secretary Of State 10/24/2023 11:38 Am
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/25/2023
|
Approved By Governor 10/24/2023 10:06 Am
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/24/2023
|
Presented To Governor 10/24/2023 09:15 Am
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/18/2023
|
Ordered Enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/18/2023
|
Title Amendment Agreed To
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/18/2023
|
Given Immediate Effect
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/18/2023
|
Roll Call: Roll Call # 534 Yeas 29 Nays 9 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/18/2023
|
House Substitute (h-1) Concurred In
|
|
|
House
|
10/12/2023
|
Returned To Senate
|
|
|
House
|
10/12/2023
|
Title Amended
|
|
|
House
|
10/12/2023
|
Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 351 Yeas 56 Nays 54 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
House
|
10/12/2023
|
Read A Third Time
|
|
|
House
|
10/05/2023
|
Placed On Third Reading
|
|
|
House
|
10/05/2023
|
Substitute (h-1) Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
10/05/2023
|
Read A Second Time
|
|
|
House
|
10/05/2023
|
Placed On Second Reading
|
|
|
House
|
10/05/2023
|
Motion To Discharge Committee Approved
|
|
|
House
|
10/04/2023
|
Notice Given To Discharge Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Natural Resources, Environment, Tourism And Outdoor Recreation
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Read A First Time
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Received On 04/20/2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Passed Roll Call # 129 Yeas 31 Nays 6 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Substitute (s-3) Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Vote Reconsidered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Substitute (s-3) Defeated
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Substitute (s-1) Concurred In
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Committee Recommended Immediate Effect
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Energy And Environment
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
Introduced By Senator Sylvia Santana
|
|
|