Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan Senate Bill SB0088 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 21, 2023

Engrossed

Bill October 12, 2023
Bill April 20, 2023

Enrolled

Bill October 24, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis October 31, 2023

Chaptered

Bill October 25, 2023