Senate
|
07/18/2023
|
Assigned Pa 0066'23 With Immediate Effect
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/18/2023
|
Filed With Secretary Of State 07/12/2023 10:24 Am
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/18/2023
|
Approved By Governor 07/11/2023 12:52 Pm
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/18/2023
|
Presented To Governor 07/06/2023 02:08 Pm
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2023
|
Ordered Enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2023
|
Given Immediate Effect
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2023
|
Roll Call: Roll Call # 387 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2023
|
House Substitute (h-1) Concurred In
|
|
|
House
|
06/14/2023
|
Returned To Senate
|
|
|
House
|
06/14/2023
|
Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 150 Yeas 93 Nays 16 Excused 0 Not Voting 1
|
|
|
House
|
06/14/2023
|
Read A Third Time
|
|
|
House
|
06/13/2023
|
Placed On Third Reading
|
|
|
House
|
06/13/2023
|
Substitute (h-1) Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
06/13/2023
|
Read A Second Time
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Referred To Second Reading
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1)
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Transportation, Mobility And Infrastructure
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Placed On Second Reading
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Motion To Discharge Committee Approved
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Rule Suspended
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Read A First Time
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Received On 05/10/2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Passed Roll Call # 187 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Substitute (s-1) Concurred In
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Introduced By Senator Darrin Camilleri
|
|
|