Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan Senate Bill SB0125 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 1, 2023

Engrossed

Bill June 14, 2023
Bill May 10, 2023

Enrolled

Bill July 6, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis July 23, 2023

Chaptered

Bill July 13, 2023