Senate
|
07/20/2023
|
Assigned Pa 0093'23 With Immediate Effect
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/20/2023
|
Filed With Secretary Of State 07/19/2023 10:44 Am
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/20/2023
|
Approved By Governor 07/18/2023 11:48 Am
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/18/2023
|
Presented To Governor 07/06/2023 02:36 Pm
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2023
|
Ordered Enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2023
|
Full Title Agreed To
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2023
|
Given Immediate Effect
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2023
|
Returned To Senate
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2023
|
Inserted Full Title
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2023
|
Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 205 Yeas 72 Nays 37 Excused 0 Not Voting 1
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2023
|
Read A Third Time
|
|
|
House
|
06/14/2023
|
Placed On Third Reading
|
|
|
House
|
06/14/2023
|
Read A Second Time
|
|
|
House
|
06/13/2023
|
Referred To Second Reading
|
|
|
House
|
06/13/2023
|
Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Per Rule 41 Referred To Committee On Economic Development And Small Business
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Tax Policy
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Read A First Time
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Received On 03/23/2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Passed Roll Call # 112 Yeas 25 Nays 13 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Placed On Order Of Third Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Referred To Committee Of The Whole
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Committee Recommended Immediate Effect
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Reported Favorably Without Amendment
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Reassigned To Committee On Housing And Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Economic And Community Development
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
Introduced By Senator Sue Shink
|
|
|