Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan Senate Bill SB0132 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 2, 2023

Engrossed

Bill June 21, 2023
Bill March 23, 2023

Enrolled

Bill July 6, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis September 20, 2023

Chaptered

Bill July 27, 2023