Senate | 12/29/2023 | Assigned Pa 0313'23 | ||
Senate | 12/29/2023 | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/14/2023 10:12 Am | ||
Senate | 12/29/2023 | Approved By Governor 12/13/2023 05:04 Pm | ||
Senate | 12/29/2023 | Presented To Governor 12/06/2023 09:16 Am | ||
Senate | 11/09/2023 | Ordered Enrolled | ||
House | 11/08/2023 | Returned To Senate | ||
House | 11/08/2023 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 520 Yeas 69 Nays 40 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 | ||
House | 11/08/2023 | Read A Third Time | ||
House | 11/08/2023 | Placed On Immediate Passage | ||
House | 11/08/2023 | Placed On Third Reading | ||
House | 11/08/2023 | Read A Second Time | ||
House | 11/02/2023 | Referred To Second Reading | ||
House | 11/02/2023 | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment | ||
House | 10/10/2023 | Read A First Time | ||
House | 10/10/2023 | Received On 10/10/2023 | ||
Senate | 10/10/2023 | Passed Roll Call # 506 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 | ||
House | 10/10/2023 | Referred To Committee On Health Policy | ||
Senate | 10/05/2023 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1) | ||
Senate | 10/05/2023 | Substitute (s-1) Concurred In | ||
Senate | 10/05/2023 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1) | ||
Senate | 09/28/2023 | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1) | ||
Senate | 09/28/2023 | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-1) | ||
Senate | 03/02/2023 | Introduced By Senator Sean Mccann |