Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan Senate Bill SB0133 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 2, 2023

Engrossed

Bill November 8, 2023
Bill October 10, 2023

Enrolled

Bill December 6, 2023

Chaptered

Bill December 18, 2023