Senate
|
07/30/2024
|
Assigned Pa 0097'24
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/30/2024
|
Filed With Secretary Of State 07/23/2024 12:02 Pm
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/30/2024
|
Approved By Governor 07/23/2024 10:02 Am
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/30/2024
|
Presented To Governor 07/11/2024 01:58 Pm
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2024
|
Ordered Enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2024
|
Full Title Agreed To
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2024
|
Roll Call: Roll Call # 319 Yeas 20 Nays 18 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2024
|
House Substitute (h-2) Concurred In
|
|
|
House
|
06/26/2024
|
Returned To Senate
|
|
|
House
|
06/26/2024
|
Inserted Full Title
|
|
|
House
|
06/26/2024
|
Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 255 Yeas 56 Nays 54 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
House
|
06/26/2024
|
Read A Third Time
|
|
|
House
|
06/26/2024
|
Placed On Immediate Passage
|
|
|
House
|
06/26/2024
|
Placed On Third Reading
|
|
|
House
|
06/26/2024
|
Substitute (h-2) Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
06/26/2024
|
Substitute (h-1) Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
06/26/2024
|
Read A Second Time
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Referred To Second Reading
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1)
|
|
|
House
|
10/24/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Tax Policy
|
|
|
House
|
10/24/2023
|
Read A First Time
|
|
|
House
|
10/24/2023
|
Received On 10/20/2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/19/2023
|
Passed Roll Call # 556 Yeas 21 Nays 17 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/19/2023
|
Amendment(s) Defeated
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/18/2023
|
Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/18/2023
|
Substitute (s-1) Concurred In
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/18/2023
|
Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/05/2023
|
Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/05/2023
|
Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Finance, Insurance, And Consumer Protection
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
Introduced By Senator Sylvia Santana
|
|
|