Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan Senate Bill SB0175 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 14, 2023

Engrossed

Bill June 26, 2024
Bill October 19, 2023

Enrolled

Bill July 11, 2024

Chaptered

Bill July 25, 2024