Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Referred To Conference Committee
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2023
|
House Conferees Named 06/06/2023: Reps. Regina Weiss Jason Morgan Nancy Deboer
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Senate Conferees Named 05/23/2023: Sens. Rosemary Bayer Veronica Klinefelt Jon Bumstead
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Re-received From Senate With Notice Of Nonconcurrence In House Substitute (h-1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Senate Named Conferees 05/23/2023: Sens. Rosemary Bayer, Veronica Klinefelt, Jon Bumstead
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Roll Call: Roll Call # 308 Yeas 1 Nays 37 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
House Substitute (h-1) Nonconcurred In
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Laid Over One Day Under The Rules
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Returned To Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 112 Yeas 56 Nays 51 Excused 0 Not Voting 3
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Read A Third Time
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Placed On Third Reading
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Substitute (h-1) Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Read A Second Time
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Placed On Second Reading
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Motion To Discharge Committee Approved
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Placed On Immediate Passage
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Notice Given To Discharge Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Read A First Time
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Received On 05/10/2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Passed Roll Call # 198 Yeas 20 Nays 18 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Amendment(s) Defeated
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Rules Suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Substitute (s-1) Concurred In
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1)
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Committee Recommended Immediate Effect
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
Introduced By Senator Rosemary Bayer
|
|
|