Senate
|
07/18/2023
|
Assigned Pa 0072'23 With Immediate Effect
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/18/2023
|
Filed With Secretary Of State 07/12/2023 10:36 Am
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/18/2023
|
Approved By Governor 07/11/2023 01:06 Pm
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/18/2023
|
Presented To Governor 07/06/2023 02:42 Pm
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2023
|
Ordered Enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2023
|
Full Title Agreed To
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2023
|
Given Immediate Effect
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2023
|
Roll Call: Roll Call # 430 Yeas 36 Nays 1 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2023
|
House Substitute (h-1) Concurred In
|
|
|
House
|
06/28/2023
|
Returned To Senate
|
|
|
House
|
06/28/2023
|
Inserted Full Title
|
|
|
House
|
06/28/2023
|
Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 250 Yeas 103 Nays 5 Excused 0 Not Voting 2
|
|
|
House
|
06/28/2023
|
Read A Third Time
|
|
|
House
|
06/28/2023
|
Placed On Third Reading
|
|
|
House
|
06/28/2023
|
Substitute (h-1) Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
06/28/2023
|
Read A Second Time
|
|
|
House
|
06/28/2023
|
Placed On Second Reading
|
|
|
House
|
06/28/2023
|
Motion To Discharge Committee Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/28/2023
|
Placed On Immediate Passage
|
|
|
House
|
06/27/2023
|
Notice Given To Discharge Committee
|
|
|
House
|
06/22/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Criminal Justice
|
|
|
House
|
06/22/2023
|
Read A First Time
|
|
|
House
|
06/22/2023
|
Received On 06/22/2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2023
|
Passed Roll Call # 372 Yeas 35 Nays 2 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2023
|
Rules Suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2023
|
Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2023
|
Substitute (s-1) Concurred In
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2023
|
Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2023
|
Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2023
|
Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Civil Rights, Judiciary, And Public Safety
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Introduced By Senator Veronica Klinefelt
|
|
|