Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan Senate Bill SB0212 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 16, 2023

Engrossed

Bill June 28, 2023
Bill June 22, 2023

Enrolled

Bill July 6, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis September 20, 2023

Chaptered

Bill July 13, 2023