Senate
|
06/11/2024
|
Assigned Pa 0050'24 With Immediate Effect
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2024
|
Filed With Secretary Of State 06/06/2024 01:54 Pm
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2024
|
Approved By Governor 06/06/2024 11:54 Am
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2024
|
Presented To Governor 05/28/2024 11:32 Am
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
Title Amendment Agreed To
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
Given Immediate Effect
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
Roll Call: Roll Call # 143 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 2 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
House Substitute (h-1) Concurred In
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
Ordered Enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2024
|
Title Amended
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2024
|
Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 83 Yeas 103 Nays 4 Excused 0 Not Voting 3
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2024
|
Rule Suspended
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2024
|
Returned To Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2024
|
Vote Reconsidered
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2024
|
Defeated Roll Call # 2 Yeas 52 Nays 52 Excused 0 Not Voting 4
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2024
|
Substitute (h-1) Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2024
|
Vote On Passage Reconsidered
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2024
|
Returned As Requested
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2024
|
Enrollment Vacated
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2024
|
House Requests Return
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 512 Yeas 105 Nays 4 Excused 0 Not Voting 1
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Read A Third Time
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Placed On Immediate Passage
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Placed On Third Reading
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Read A Second Time
|
|
|
House
|
11/02/2023
|
Referred To Second Reading
|
|
|
House
|
11/02/2023
|
Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment
|
|
|
House
|
10/24/2023
|
Read A First Time
|
|
|
House
|
10/24/2023
|
Received On 10/20/2023
|
|
|
House
|
10/24/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Health Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/19/2023
|
Passed Roll Call # 549 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/19/2023
|
Substitute Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/18/2023
|
Postponed For The Day
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/18/2023
|
Passed Roll Call # 536 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/12/2023
|
Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/12/2023
|
Substitute (s-1) Concurred In
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/12/2023
|
Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/12/2023
|
Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/12/2023
|
Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Introduced By Senator Dan Lauwers
|
|
|