Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan Senate Bill SB0227 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 22, 2023

Engrossed

Bill November 8, 2023
Bill October 18, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 28, 2024

Chaptered

Bill June 7, 2024