Senate | 12/29/2023 | Assigned Pa 0223'23 | ||
Senate | 12/29/2023 | Filed With Secretary Of State 11/22/2023 01:48 Pm | ||
Senate | 12/29/2023 | Approved By Governor 11/22/2023 11:42 Am | ||
Senate | 12/29/2023 | Presented To Governor 11/21/2023 10:18 Am | ||
Senate | 11/02/2023 | Ordered Enrolled | ||
Senate | 11/02/2023 | Full Title Agreed To | ||
House | 11/01/2023 | Returned To Senate | ||
House | 11/01/2023 | Inserted Full Title | ||
House | 11/01/2023 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 437 Yeas 90 Nays 20 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 | ||
House | 11/01/2023 | Read A Third Time | ||
House | 10/31/2023 | Placed On Third Reading | ||
House | 10/31/2023 | Read A Second Time | ||
House | 09/12/2023 | Referred To Second Reading | ||
House | 09/12/2023 | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment | ||
House | 05/23/2023 | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform | ||
House | 05/23/2023 | Read A First Time | ||
House | 05/23/2023 | Received On 05/23/2023 | ||
Senate | 05/23/2023 | Passed Roll Call # 317 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 | ||
Senate | 05/23/2023 | Placed On Immediate Passage | ||
Senate | 05/23/2023 | Rules Suspended | ||
Senate | 05/23/2023 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1) | ||
Senate | 05/23/2023 | Substitute (s-1) Concurred In | ||
Senate | 05/23/2023 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1) | ||
Senate | 05/23/2023 | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1) | ||
Senate | 05/23/2023 | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-1) | ||
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Affairs | ||
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Introduced By Senator Jeff Irwin |