Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan Senate Bill SB0262 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill April 12, 2023

Engrossed

Bill November 1, 2023
Bill May 23, 2023

Enrolled

Bill November 21, 2023

Chaptered

Bill November 28, 2023