Senate | 12/29/2023 | Assigned Pa 0238'23 | ||
Senate | 12/29/2023 | Filed With Secretary Of State 11/30/2023 10:08 Am | ||
Senate | 12/29/2023 | Approved By Governor 11/29/2023 05:04 Pm | ||
Senate | 12/29/2023 | Presented To Governor 11/27/2023 02:28 Pm | ||
Senate | 11/09/2023 | Ordered Enrolled | ||
House | 11/08/2023 | Returned To Senate | ||
House | 11/08/2023 | Inserted Full Title | ||
House | 11/08/2023 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 510 Yeas 77 Nays 32 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 | ||
House | 11/08/2023 | Read A Third Time | ||
House | 11/08/2023 | Placed On Immediate Passage | ||
House | 11/08/2023 | Placed On Third Reading | ||
House | 11/08/2023 | Read A Second Time | ||
House | 10/25/2023 | Referred To Second Reading | ||
House | 10/25/2023 | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment | ||
House | 09/26/2023 | Referred To Committee On Local Government And Municipal Finance | ||
House | 09/26/2023 | Read A First Time | ||
House | 09/26/2023 | Received On 09/26/2023 | ||
Senate | 09/26/2023 | Passed Roll Call # 454 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 | ||
Senate | 09/19/2023 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1) | ||
Senate | 09/19/2023 | Substitute (s-1) Concurred In | ||
Senate | 09/19/2023 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1) | ||
Senate | 09/13/2023 | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1) | ||
Senate | 09/13/2023 | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-1) | ||
Senate | 05/11/2023 | Referred To Committee On Local Government | ||
Senate | 05/11/2023 | Introduced By Senator Dayna Polehanki |