Senate | 10/09/2024 | Assigned Pa 0130'24 With Immediate Effect | ||
Senate | 10/09/2024 | Filed With Secretary Of State 10/08/2024 01:04 Pm | ||
Senate | 10/09/2024 | Approved By Governor 10/08/2024 10:36 Am | ||
Senate | 10/08/2024 | Presented To Governor 10/07/2024 11:02 Am | ||
Senate | 09/26/2024 | Ordered Enrolled | ||
Senate | 09/26/2024 | Full Title Agreed To | ||
Senate | 09/26/2024 | Given Immediate Effect | ||
House | 09/25/2024 | Returned To Senate | ||
House | 09/25/2024 | Inserted Full Title | ||
House | 09/25/2024 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 322 Yeas 83 Nays 26 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 | ||
House | 09/25/2024 | Read A Third Time | ||
House | 09/25/2024 | Placed On Immediate Passage | ||
House | 09/25/2024 | Placed On Third Reading | ||
House | 09/25/2024 | Read A Second Time | ||
House | 05/22/2024 | Referred To Second Reading | ||
House | 05/22/2024 | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment | ||
House | 10/18/2023 | Referred To Committee On Judiciary | ||
House | 10/18/2023 | Read A First Time | ||
House | 10/18/2023 | Received On 10/18/2023 | ||
Senate | 10/18/2023 | Passed Roll Call # 546 Yeas 26 Nays 12 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 | ||
Senate | 10/18/2023 | Amendment(s) Defeated | ||
Senate | 10/17/2023 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading | ||
Senate | 10/17/2023 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) | ||
Senate | 10/12/2023 | Referred To Committee Of The Whole | ||
Senate | 10/12/2023 | Reported Favorably Without Amendment | ||
Senate | 05/23/2023 | Referred To Committee On Health Policy | ||
Senate | 05/23/2023 | Introduced By Senator Jeff Irwin |