Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan Senate Bill SB0351 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill May 23, 2023

Engrossed

Bill September 25, 2024
Bill October 18, 2023

Enrolled

Bill October 7, 2024

Chaptered

Bill October 9, 2024