Senate
|
10/09/2024
|
Assigned Pa 0131'24 With Immediate Effect
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/09/2024
|
Filed With Secretary Of State 10/08/2024 01:06 Pm
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/09/2024
|
Approved By Governor 10/08/2024 10:38 Am
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/08/2024
|
Presented To Governor 10/07/2024 11:04 Am
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/26/2024
|
Ordered Enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/26/2024
|
Given Immediate Effect
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/26/2024
|
House Amendment(s) Concurred In Roll Call # 359 Yeas 30 Nays 7 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
House
|
06/27/2024
|
Returned To Senate
|
|
|
House
|
06/27/2024
|
Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 277 Yeas 89 Nays 21 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
House
|
06/27/2024
|
Read A Third Time
|
|
|
House
|
06/26/2024
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
06/26/2024
|
Amendment(s) Reconsidered
|
|
|
House
|
06/26/2024
|
Motion To Refer To Third Reading Reconsidered
|
|
|
House
|
06/26/2024
|
Placed On Third Reading
|
|
|
House
|
06/26/2024
|
Read A Second Time
|
|
|
House
|
06/26/2024
|
Placed On Second Reading
|
|
|
House
|
06/26/2024
|
Motion To Discharge Committee Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/26/2024
|
Rule Suspended
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Referred To Committee On Energy, Communications, And Technology
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Read A First Time
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Received On 02/22/2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Passed Roll Call # 28 Yeas 32 Nays 5 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Placed On Order Of Third Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Referred To Committee Of The Whole
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Reported Favorably Without Amendment
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Energy And Environment
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2023
|
Introduced By Senator Sean Mccann
|
|
|