Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan Senate Bill SB0366 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill May 30, 2023

Engrossed

Bill June 27, 2024
Bill February 22, 2024

Enrolled

Bill October 7, 2024

Chaptered

Bill October 9, 2024