Senate
|
12/29/2023
|
Assigned Pa 0267'23
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/29/2023
|
Filed With Secretary Of State 12/01/2023 11:34 Am
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/29/2023
|
Approved By Governor 11/30/2023 12:48 Pm
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/29/2023
|
Presented To Governor 11/21/2023 10:44 Am
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/09/2023
|
Ordered Enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/09/2023
|
Title Amendment Agreed To
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/09/2023
|
Roll Call: Roll Call # 707 Yeas 30 Nays 8 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/09/2023
|
House Substitute (h-2) Concurred In
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Passed Roll Call # 551 Yeas 56 Nays 53 Excused 0 Not Voting 1
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Substitute (h-2) Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Vote Reconsidered
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Rule Suspended
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Returned As Requested
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Returned To Senate
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Title Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/02/2023
|
Return Granted
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/02/2023
|
House Requests Return
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/05/2023
|
Laid Over One Day Under The Rules
|
|
|
House
|
10/04/2023
|
Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 338 Yeas 100 Nays 8 Excused 0 Not Voting 2
|
|
|
House
|
10/04/2023
|
Read A Third Time
|
|
|
House
|
09/28/2023
|
Placed On Third Reading
|
|
|
House
|
09/28/2023
|
Substitute (h-1) Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
09/28/2023
|
Read A Second Time
|
|
|
House
|
09/19/2023
|
Referred To Second Reading
|
|
|
House
|
09/19/2023
|
Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1)
|
|
|
House
|
06/14/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Elections
|
|
|
House
|
06/14/2023
|
Read A First Time
|
|
|
House
|
06/14/2023
|
Received On 06/14/2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2023
|
Passed Roll Call # 368 Yeas 32 Nays 6 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2023
|
Placed On Immediate Passage
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2023
|
Rules Suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2023
|
Placed On Order Of Third Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2023
|
Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2023
|
Referred To Committee Of The Whole
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2023
|
Reported Favorably Without Amendment
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Elections And Ethics
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2023
|
Introduced By Senator Jeremy Moss
|
|
|