Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan Senate Bill SB0374 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill June 6, 2023

Engrossed

Bill October 4, 2023
Bill June 14, 2023

Enrolled

Bill November 21, 2023

Chaptered

Bill December 4, 2023