Senate
|
12/29/2023
|
Assigned Pa 0241'23
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/29/2023
|
Filed With Secretary Of State 11/30/2023 10:14 Am
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/29/2023
|
Approved By Governor 11/29/2023 05:10 Pm
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/29/2023
|
Presented To Governor 11/27/2023 02:26 Pm
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/08/2023
|
Ordered Enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/08/2023
|
Title Amendment Agreed To
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/08/2023
|
Roll Call: Roll Call # 671 Yeas 24 Nays 13 Excused 0 Not Voting 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/08/2023
|
House Substitute (h-1) Concurred In
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/02/2023
|
Laid Over One Day Under The Rules
|
|
|
House
|
11/02/2023
|
Returned To Senate
|
|
|
House
|
11/02/2023
|
Title Amended
|
|
|
House
|
11/02/2023
|
Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 480 Yeas 56 Nays 52 Excused 0 Not Voting 2
|
|
|
House
|
11/02/2023
|
Read A Third Time
|
|
|
House
|
11/02/2023
|
Placed On Immediate Passage
|
|
|
House
|
11/02/2023
|
Placed On Third Reading
|
|
|
House
|
11/02/2023
|
Substitute (h-1) Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
11/02/2023
|
Read A Second Time
|
|
|
House
|
11/01/2023
|
Referred To Second Reading
|
|
|
House
|
11/01/2023
|
Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment
|
|
|
House
|
10/12/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Government Operations
|
|
|
House
|
10/12/2023
|
Read A First Time
|
|
|
House
|
10/12/2023
|
Received On 10/12/2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/12/2023
|
Passed Roll Call # 532 Yeas 24 Nays 13 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/12/2023
|
Postponed Temporarily
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/11/2023
|
Placed On Order Of Third Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/11/2023
|
Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/27/2023
|
Referred To Committee Of The Whole
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/27/2023
|
Reported Favorably Without Amendment
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Housing And Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2023
|
Introduced By Senator Stephanie Chang
|
|
|