Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan Senate Bill SB0382 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill June 8, 2023

Engrossed

Bill November 2, 2023
Bill October 12, 2023

Enrolled

Bill November 27, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis May 14, 2024

Chaptered

Bill December 1, 2023