Senate | 11/08/2023 | Assigned Pa 0192'23 With Immediate Effect | ||
Senate | 11/08/2023 | Filed With Secretary Of State 11/07/2023 02:30 Pm | ||
Senate | 11/08/2023 | Approved By Governor 11/07/2023 01:22 Pm | ||
Senate | 10/31/2023 | Presented To Governor 10/27/2023 02:22 Pm | ||
Senate | 10/19/2023 | Ordered Enrolled | ||
Senate | 10/19/2023 | Full Title Agreed To | ||
Senate | 10/19/2023 | Given Immediate Effect | ||
House | 10/18/2023 | Returned To Senate | ||
House | 10/18/2023 | Inserted Full Title | ||
House | 10/18/2023 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 375 Yeas 104 Nays 6 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 | ||
House | 10/18/2023 | Read A Third Time | ||
House | 10/17/2023 | Placed On Third Reading | ||
House | 10/17/2023 | Read A Second Time | ||
House | 10/05/2023 | Referred To Second Reading | ||
House | 10/05/2023 | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment | ||
House | 06/28/2023 | Read A First Time | ||
House | 06/28/2023 | Received On 06/28/2023 | ||
House | 06/28/2023 | Referred To Committee On Health Policy | ||
Senate | 06/27/2023 | Passed Roll Call # 408 Yeas 35 Nays 1 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 | ||
Senate | 06/27/2023 | Placed On Immediate Passage | ||
Senate | 06/27/2023 | Rules Suspended | ||
Senate | 06/27/2023 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading | ||
Senate | 06/27/2023 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) | ||
Senate | 06/27/2023 | Referred To Committee Of The Whole | ||
Senate | 06/27/2023 | Reported Favorably Without Amendment | ||
Senate | 06/13/2023 | Introduced By Senator Kevin Hertel |