Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan Senate Bill SB0384 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill June 13, 2023

Engrossed

Bill October 18, 2023
Bill June 27, 2023

Enrolled

Bill October 27, 2023

Chaptered

Bill November 8, 2023