House | 12/10/2024 | Placed On Second Reading | ||
House | 12/10/2024 | Rule Suspended | ||
House | 12/10/2024 | Read A First Time | ||
House | 12/05/2024 | Received On 12/05/2024 | ||
Senate | 12/05/2024 | Passed Roll Call # 439 Yeas 29 Nays 7 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 | ||
Senate | 12/04/2024 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1) | ||
Senate | 12/04/2024 | Substitute (s-1) Concurred In | ||
Senate | 12/04/2024 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1) | ||
Senate | 11/26/2024 | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1) | ||
Senate | 11/26/2024 | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect | ||
Senate | 11/26/2024 | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-1) | ||
Senate | 06/22/2023 | Referred To Committee On Appropriations | ||
Senate | 06/22/2023 | Introduced By Senator Sarah Anthony |