Senate | 12/29/2023 | Assigned Pa 0319'23 With Immediate Effect | ||
Senate | 12/29/2023 | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/14/2023 10:24 Am | ||
Senate | 12/29/2023 | Approved By Governor 12/13/2023 05:16 Pm | ||
Senate | 12/29/2023 | Presented To Governor 12/06/2023 09:10 Am | ||
Senate | 11/02/2023 | Ordered Enrolled | ||
Senate | 11/02/2023 | Full Title Agreed To | ||
Senate | 11/02/2023 | Given Immediate Effect | ||
House | 11/01/2023 | Returned To Senate | ||
House | 11/01/2023 | Inserted Full Title | ||
House | 11/01/2023 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 438 Yeas 104 Nays 6 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 | ||
House | 11/01/2023 | Read A Third Time | ||
House | 10/31/2023 | Placed On Third Reading | ||
House | 10/31/2023 | Read A Second Time | ||
House | 10/19/2023 | Referred To Second Reading | ||
House | 10/19/2023 | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment | ||
House | 10/04/2023 | Read A First Time | ||
House | 10/04/2023 | Received On 10/04/2023 | ||
Senate | 10/04/2023 | Passed Roll Call # 492 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 | ||
House | 10/04/2023 | Referred To Committee On Health Policy | ||
Senate | 10/03/2023 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading | ||
Senate | 10/03/2023 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) | ||
Senate | 09/28/2023 | Referred To Committee Of The Whole | ||
Senate | 09/28/2023 | Reported Favorably Without Amendment | ||
Senate | 09/20/2023 | Introduced By Senator Edward Mcbroom |