Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan Senate Bill SB0513 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill September 20, 2023

Engrossed

Bill November 1, 2023
Bill October 4, 2023

Enrolled

Bill December 6, 2023

Chaptered

Bill December 18, 2023