Senate
|
12/29/2023
|
Assigned Pa 0269'23
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/29/2023
|
Filed With Secretary Of State 12/01/2023 11:38 Am
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/29/2023
|
Approved By Governor 11/30/2023 12:52 Pm
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/29/2023
|
Presented To Governor 11/21/2023 10:48 Am
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/09/2023
|
Ordered Enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/09/2023
|
Title Amendment Agreed To
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/09/2023
|
Roll Call: Roll Call # 708 Yeas 20 Nays 18 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/09/2023
|
House Substitute (h-2) Concurred In
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Returned To Senate
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Title Amended
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 511 Yeas 56 Nays 53 Excused 0 Not Voting 1
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Read A Third Time
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Substitute (h-2) Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Placed On Third Reading
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Substitute (h-1) Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Read A Second Time
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Placed On Immediate Passage
|
|
|
House
|
10/31/2023
|
Referred To Second Reading
|
|
|
House
|
10/31/2023
|
Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1)
|
|
|
House
|
10/24/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Elections
|
|
|
House
|
10/24/2023
|
Read A First Time
|
|
|
House
|
10/24/2023
|
Received On 10/20/2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/19/2023
|
Passed Roll Call # 569 Yeas 20 Nays 18 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/19/2023
|
Rules Suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/19/2023
|
Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-2)
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/19/2023
|
Substitute (s-2) Concurred In
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/19/2023
|
Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-2)
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/10/2023
|
Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/10/2023
|
Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/26/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Elections And Ethics
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/26/2023
|
Introduced By Senator Jeremy Moss
|
|
|