Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan Senate Bill SB0529 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill September 26, 2023

Engrossed

Bill November 8, 2023
Bill October 19, 2023

Enrolled

Bill November 21, 2023

Chaptered

Bill December 4, 2023