Senate | 12/29/2023 | Assigned Pa 0282'23 | ||
Senate | 12/29/2023 | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/08/2023 10:26 Am | ||
Senate | 12/29/2023 | Approved By Governor 12/07/2023 10:18 Am | ||
Senate | 12/29/2023 | Presented To Governor 12/06/2023 09:40 Am | ||
Senate | 11/09/2023 | Ordered Enrolled | ||
Senate | 11/09/2023 | Roll Call: Roll Call # 710 Yeas 36 Nays 2 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 | ||
Senate | 11/09/2023 | House Substitute (h-2) Concurred In | ||
House | 11/09/2023 | Returned To Senate | ||
House | 11/09/2023 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 553 Yeas 61 Nays 47 Excused 0 Not Voting 2 | ||
House | 11/09/2023 | Read A Third Time | ||
House | 11/09/2023 | Placed On Third Reading | ||
House | 11/09/2023 | Substitute (h-2) Adopted | ||
House | 11/09/2023 | Read A Second Time | ||
House | 11/09/2023 | Placed On Immediate Passage | ||
House | 11/01/2023 | Placed On Second Reading | ||
House | 11/01/2023 | Read A First Time | ||
House | 11/01/2023 | Rule Suspended | ||
House | 11/01/2023 | Received On 11/01/2023 | ||
Senate | 11/01/2023 | Passed Roll Call # 634 Yeas 36 Nays 2 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 | ||
Senate | 11/01/2023 | Rules Suspended | ||
Senate | 11/01/2023 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-3) As Amended | ||
Senate | 11/01/2023 | Substitute (s-3) As Amended Concurred In | ||
Senate | 11/01/2023 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-3) And Amendment(s) | ||
Senate | 11/01/2023 | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-2) | ||
Senate | 11/01/2023 | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-2) | ||
Senate | 10/24/2023 | Referred To Committee On Oversight | ||
Senate | 10/24/2023 | Introduced By Senator Sam Singh |