Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan Senate Bill SB0614 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill October 24, 2023

Engrossed

Bill November 9, 2023
Bill November 6, 2023

Enrolled

Bill December 6, 2023

Chaptered

Bill December 11, 2023