Senate
|
10/09/2024
|
Assigned Pa 0133'24
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/09/2024
|
Filed With Secretary Of State 10/08/2024 01:10 Pm
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/09/2024
|
Approved By Governor 10/08/2024 10:42 Am
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/08/2024
|
Presented To Governor 10/07/2024 11:08 Am
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/26/2024
|
Ordered Enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/26/2024
|
Full Title Agreed To
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/26/2024
|
House Amendment(s) Concurred In Roll Call # 362 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
House
|
06/27/2024
|
Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 293 Yeas 110 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
House
|
06/27/2024
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
06/27/2024
|
Returned To Senate
|
|
|
House
|
06/27/2024
|
Inserted Full Title
|
|
|
House
|
06/26/2024
|
Postponed Temporarily
|
|
|
House
|
06/26/2024
|
Vote On Passage Reconsidered
|
|
|
House
|
06/26/2024
|
Rule Suspended
|
|
|
House
|
06/26/2024
|
Returned As Requested
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2024
|
Return Granted
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2024
|
House Requests Return
|
|
|
House
|
06/20/2024
|
Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 203 Yeas 109 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 1
|
|
|
House
|
06/20/2024
|
Read A Third Time
|
|
|
House
|
06/18/2024
|
Placed On Third Reading
|
|
|
House
|
06/18/2024
|
Read A Second Time
|
|
|
House
|
06/11/2024
|
Referred To Second Reading
|
|
|
House
|
06/11/2024
|
Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2024
|
Referred To Committee On Transportation, Mobility And Infrastructure
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2024
|
Read A First Time
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2024
|
Received On 03/19/2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
Passed Roll Call # 68 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
Placed On Immediate Passage
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
Rules Suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
Placed On Order Of Third Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
Referred To Committee Of The Whole
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
Reported Favorably Without Amendment
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2024
|
Referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2024
|
Introduced By Senator Veronica Klinefelt
|
|
|