Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan Senate Bill SB0716 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 7, 2024

Engrossed

Bill June 20, 2024
Bill March 19, 2024

Enrolled

Bill October 7, 2024

Chaptered

Bill October 9, 2024