Senate | 12/30/2024 | Assigned Pa 0172'24 | ||
Senate | 12/30/2024 | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/23/2024 11:06 Am | ||
Senate | 12/30/2024 | Approved By Governor 12/23/2024 09:58 Am | ||
Senate | 12/11/2024 | Presented To Governor 12/10/2024 09:20 Am | ||
Senate | 12/05/2024 | Ordered Enrolled | ||
Senate | 12/05/2024 | Full Title Agreed To | ||
House | 11/13/2024 | Returned To Senate | ||
House | 11/13/2024 | Title Amended | ||
House | 11/13/2024 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 348 Yeas 56 Nays 53 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 | ||
House | 11/13/2024 | Read A Third Time | ||
House | 11/13/2024 | Placed On Immediate Passage | ||
House | 11/13/2024 | Placed On Third Reading | ||
House | 11/13/2024 | Read A Second Time | ||
House | 09/25/2024 | Referred To Second Reading | ||
House | 09/25/2024 | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment | ||
House | 06/26/2024 | Read A First Time | ||
House | 06/26/2024 | Received On 06/26/2024 | ||
Senate | 06/26/2024 | Passed Roll Call # 288 Yeas 20 Nays 18 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 | ||
House | 06/26/2024 | Referred To Committee On Labor | ||
Senate | 06/25/2024 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1) | ||
Senate | 06/25/2024 | Substitute (s-1) Concurred In | ||
Senate | 06/25/2024 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1) | ||
Senate | 06/18/2024 | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1) | ||
Senate | 06/18/2024 | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-1) | ||
Senate | 03/06/2024 | Introduced By Senator Darrin Camilleri |