Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan Senate Bill SB0740 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 6, 2024

Engrossed

Bill November 13, 2024
Bill June 26, 2024

Enrolled

Bill December 10, 2024

Chaptered

Bill December 26, 2024