Senate
|
07/30/2024
|
Assigned Pa 0116'24 With Immediate Effect
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/30/2024
|
Filed With Secretary Of State 07/23/2024 12:40 Pm
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/30/2024
|
Approved By Governor 07/23/2024 10:40 Am
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/30/2024
|
Presented To Governor 07/11/2024 01:56 Pm
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2024
|
Ordered Enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2024
|
Full Title Agreed To
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2024
|
Given Immediate Effect
|
|
|
House
|
06/20/2024
|
Returned To Senate
|
|
|
House
|
06/20/2024
|
Inserted Full Title
|
|
|
House
|
06/20/2024
|
Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 210 Yeas 109 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 1
|
|
|
House
|
06/20/2024
|
Read A Third Time
|
|
|
House
|
06/20/2024
|
Placed On Immediate Passage
|
|
|
House
|
06/20/2024
|
Placed On Third Reading
|
|
|
House
|
06/20/2024
|
Read A Second Time
|
|
|
House
|
06/20/2024
|
Placed On Second Reading
|
|
|
House
|
06/20/2024
|
Motion To Discharge Committee Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/18/2024
|
Notice Given To Discharge Committee
|
|
|
House
|
06/12/2024
|
Referred To Committee On Tax Policy
|
|
|
House
|
06/12/2024
|
Read A First Time
|
|
|
House
|
06/12/2024
|
Received On 06/12/2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2024
|
Passed Roll Call # 244 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2024
|
Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2024
|
Substitute (s-1) Concurred In
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2024
|
Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2024
|
Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2024
|
Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2024
|
Referred To Committee On Regulatory Affairs
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2024
|
Introduced By Senator John Cherry
|
|
|