Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan Senate Bill SB0878 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill May 22, 2024

Engrossed

Bill June 20, 2024
Bill June 12, 2024

Enrolled

Bill July 11, 2024

Chaptered

Bill July 25, 2024