LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Minnesota MN
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
House
Bills
HF15
Action History
MN
Minnesota House Bill HF15
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Minnesota 2023-2024 Regular Session
Minnesota House Bill HF15
Action History
House
02/15/2023
Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means
House
02/06/2023
Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law
House
01/09/2023
Author added Pérez-Vega
House
01/05/2023
Authors added Youakim, Hortman
House
01/04/2023
Introduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety Finance and Policy