|
02/21/2023
|
Secretary of State Chapter 10
|
|
|
|
02/21/2023
|
Governor's action Approval
|
|
|
|
02/21/2023
|
Secretary of State, Filed
|
|
|
|
02/21/2023
|
Governor approval
|
|
|
|
02/21/2023
|
Presented to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2023
|
Returned from Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2023
|
Third reading Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2023
|
Special Order: Rule 45 amendment stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2023
|
Comm report: Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders SF46
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2023
|
Second reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2023
|
Referred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF46, now on General Orders
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2023
|
Introduction and first reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2023
|
Received from House
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2023
|
Author added Hussein
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2023
|
Bill was passed as amended
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2023
|
Third reading as amended
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2023
|
Point of order raised, ruled well taken
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2023
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2023
|
House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, January 26, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2023
|
House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, January 19, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2023
|
Committee report, to adopt
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2023
|
Authors added Curran and Wolgamott
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2023
|
Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means
|
|
|
House
|
01/05/2023
|
Authors added Liebling; Hicks; Hortman
|
|
|
House
|
01/04/2023
|
Introduction and first reading, referred to State and Local Government Finance and Policy
|
|
|