Minnesota 2023-2024 Regular Session

Minnesota House Bill HF35 Latest Draft

Bill / Engrossed Version Filed 01/27/2023

                            1.1	A bill for an act​
1.2 relating to state government; requiring the state forecast include the rate of inflation;​
1.3 amending Minnesota Statutes 2022, section 16A.103, subdivisions 1a, 1b.​
1.4BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF MINNESOTA:​
1.5 Section 1. Minnesota Statutes 2022, section 16A.103, subdivision 1a, is amended to read:​
1.6 Subd. 1a.Forecast parameters.The forecast must assume the continuation of current​
1.7laws and reasonable estimates of projected growth in the national and state economies and​
1.8affected populations. Revenue must be estimated for all sources provided for in current law.​
1.9Expenditures must be estimated for all obligations imposed by law and those projected to​
1.10occur as a result of inflation and variables outside the control of the legislature. Expenditure​
1.11estimates must not include an allowance for inflation.​
1.12 Sec. 2. Minnesota Statutes 2022, section 16A.103, subdivision 1b, is amended to read:​
1.13 Subd. 1b.Forecast variable.In determining the rate of inflation, the application of​
1.14inflation, the amount of state bonding as it affects debt service, the calculation of investment​
1.15income, and the other variables to be included in the expenditure part of the forecast, the​
1.16commissioner must consult with the chairs and lead minority members of the senate State​
1.17Government Finance Committee and the house of representatives Ways and Means​
1.18Committee, and legislative fiscal staff. This consultation must occur at least three weeks​
1.19before the forecast is to be released. No later than two weeks prior to the release of the​
1.20forecast, the commissioner must inform the chairs and lead minority members of the senate​
1.21State Government Finance Committee and the house of representatives Ways and Means​
1​Sec. 2.​
REVISOR	SGS H0035-1​HF35  FIRST ENGROSSMENT​
State of Minnesota​
This Document can be made available​
in alternative formats upon request​
HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES​
H. F. No.  35​
NINETY-THIRD SESSION​
Authored by Stephenson; Olson, L.; Klevorn; Elkins; Youakim and others​01/04/2023​
The bill was read for the first time and referred to the Committee on State and Local Government Finance and Policy​
Adoption of Report: Re-referred to the Committee on Ways and Means​01/09/2023​
Adoption of Report: Placed on the General Register​01/11/2023​
Read for the Second Time​
Calendar for the Day, Amended​01/26/2023​
Read Third Time as Amended​ 2.1Committee, and legislative fiscal staff of any changes in these variables from the previous​
2.2forecast.​
2.3 Sec. 3. EFFECTIVE DATE.​
2.4 This act is effective the day following final enactment.​
2​Sec. 3.​
REVISOR	SGS H0035-1​HF35 FIRST ENGROSSMENT​