|
05/19/2023
|
Secretary of State Chapter 46
|
|
|
|
05/19/2023
|
Governor's action Approval
|
|
|
|
05/19/2023
|
Secretary of State, Filed
|
|
|
|
05/19/2023
|
Governor approval
|
|
|
|
05/18/2023
|
Presented to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Bill was repassed as amended by the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Third reading as amended by the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Motion prevailed
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Motion to concur with Senate amendments
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Returned from Senate with amendment
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Third reading Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Special Order: Amended
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
House rule 1.15 (c), message requesting concurrence received
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
Comm report: To pass as amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
Second reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Referred to Finance
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Introduction and first reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Received from House
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Bill was passed as amended
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Third reading as amended
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Author added Hemmingsen-Jaeger
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Monday, May 1, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Committee report, to adopt as amended
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Motion to recall and re-refer, motion prevailed Ways and Means
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
Author added Fischer
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Author added Tabke
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2023
|
Introduction and first reading, referred to State and Local Government Finance and Policy
|
|
|