Minnesota 2023-2024 Regular Session

Minnesota House Bill HF782 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 24, 2023

Engrossed

Bill May 12, 2023
Bill May 1, 2023
Bill April 25, 2023
Bill March 15, 2023