05/02/2023 | Secretary of State, Filed | |||
05/02/2023 | Governor approval | |||
05/02/2023 | Secretary of State Chapter 30 | |||
05/02/2023 | Governor's action Approval | |||
05/01/2023 | Presented to Governor | |||
Senate | 04/25/2023 | Returned from House | ||
House | 04/24/2023 | Bill was passed | ||
House | 04/24/2023 | Third reading | ||
House | 04/24/2023 | Amendments offered | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Monday, April 24, 2023 | ||
House | 04/18/2023 | Bills not identical, SF substituted on General Register | ||
House | 04/18/2023 | Second reading | ||
House | 04/17/2023 | Senate file first reading, referred for comparison HF10 | ||
House | 04/17/2023 | Received from Senate | ||
Senate | 04/17/2023 | Third reading Passed | ||
Senate | 04/17/2023 | Special Order: Amended | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Comm report: To pass | ||
Senate | 03/13/2023 | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance | ||
Senate | 03/06/2023 | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Labor | ||
Senate | 01/17/2023 | Rule 12.10: report of votes in committee | ||
Senate | 01/17/2023 | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Judiciary and Public Safety | ||
Senate | 01/12/2023 | Authors added McEwen; Abeler | ||
Senate | 01/10/2023 | Author added Klein | ||
Senate | 01/04/2023 | Referred to Labor | ||
Senate | 01/04/2023 | Introduction and first reading |