Minnesota 2023-2024 Regular Session

Minnesota Senate Bill SF10 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 3, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 17, 2023
Bill March 13, 2023
Bill March 6, 2023
Bill January 17, 2023